Nebulae INC et al v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Ochoa and Nebulae INC
Defendant: Brian Taylor and Ngu Nguyen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00946
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: At the request of counsel, the 7/23/2020 Settlement Conference is stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order 2020-12, dated 6/29/2020, the 7/23/2020 Settlement Conference set to begin at 9:00AM will be held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. The Court will initiate calls to counsel. (pvh)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You: Setting a Settlement Conference for 7/23/2020 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (gm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Brian Taylor waiver sent on 6/16/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ngu Nguyen waiver sent on 6/16/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Brian Taylor on 06/12/20 by Nebulae INC, Claudia Ochoa. Waiver of Service is due by 7/16/2020. Filed by Nebulae INC, Claudia Ochoa. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Ngu Nguyen on 06/12/20 by Nebulae INC, Claudia Ochoa. Waiver of Service is due by 7/16/2020. Filed by Nebulae INC, Claudia Ochoa. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nebulae INC. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DuBoff, Leonard)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6825922 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nebulae INC, Claudia Ochoa against All Defendants. (DuBoff, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nebulae INC et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ngu Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Ochoa
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebulae INC
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?