Davis v. Progressive Universal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Therell Davis
Defendant: Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Corporation Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Insurance Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00947
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #44 as follows: Dispositive Motions are due by 9/20/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/21/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/21/2021 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. No further extensions will be granted unless sufficient good cause is shown. (gm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 44 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #42 as follows and as modified: Discovery is to be completed by 8/20/2021. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 8/20/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/20/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/21/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/21/2021 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. Counsel are reminded to include the judge's initials 'JR' following the case number on all future pleadings. (gm)
July 9, 2021 Filing 42 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
April 12, 2021 Filing 41 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 4/12/21. The current case deadlines remain in place. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 7/12/2021. Gretchen Mandekor present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Heather Beasley; Casie Collignon present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #39 as follows: Amend all pleadings and join all claims, remedies and parties deadline reset to 7/12/2021. Discovery is to be completed by 7/12/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 7/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/9/2021 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. The Telephonic Rule 16 Conference presently set for 4/12/2021 at 1:30PM will remain as scheduled to further discuss any adjustments to these deadlines and to include additional deadlines as necessary. (gm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 4/12/2021 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
March 23, 2021 Filing 37 Answer to Amended Complaint #26 . Filed by Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Corporation, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint #26 .) (Collignon, Casie)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation #21 . Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #12 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Signed on 3/9/21 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm) Modified on 3/23/2021 to correct judge's name in docket text. NEF regenerated to the parties. (gm)
February 26, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Unavailability Filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Corporation, Inc., Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Morrison, James)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Objections to Magistrate's Findings and Recommendations #32 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 4, 2020 Filing 33 Objections Reply in Support of Objections to Magistrate's to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 should be granted/denied #21 . Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
November 30, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Objections to Magistrate's Findings and Recommendations. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): #30 Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
November 10, 2020 Filing 30 Objections to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 should be granted/denied #21 . Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Stipulation (Motion) for Extension of Time #28 as follows: Defendants will have until two (2) weeks following the Court's final ruling on the pending Findings and Recommendations #21 to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (gm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to F & R #25 . Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 11/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (cw)
October 27, 2020 Filing 26 First Amended Complaint For Invasion of Privacy and Negligence. Filed by Therell Davis against Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendations Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather) Modified on 10/28/2020, to correct motion type (cw).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #23 as follows and as modified: Amend all pleadings and join all claims, remedies and parties by 4/12/2021. Discovery is to be completed by 4/12/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/10/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/10/2021 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. (gm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Findings & Recommendation #21 is referred to Judge Marco A. Hernandez for review. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the court. Thereafter, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. (gm)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Findings & Recommendation: Progressive's Motion to Dismiss #12 should be denied as to plaintiff's claims for negligence and invasion of privacy - intrusion upon seclusion, and granted in all other respects. Progressive's request for oral argument is Denied as unnecessary. Any motion to amend the complaint must be filed within 14 days of the District Judge's order. Signed on 10/13/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Defendants. (Morrison, James)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion (for Order) for Extension of Time #17 as follows: Reply to response to dispositive motion due by 10/2/2020. Order: Resetting Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #12 from 9/21/2020 to the under advisement calendar of 10/5/2020. (gm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 Stipulated Motion for Order Extending Time for Defendants to Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 . Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #14 as follows: Response to dismissal motion due by 9/4/2020. Reply to response to dismissal motion due by 9/18/2020. Order: Resetting Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #12 from 9/8/2020 to the under advisement calendar of 9/21/2020. (gm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Stipulated Motion for Order Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo Setting Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #12 on the under advisement calendar of 9/8/2020. The request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Should the Court deem the motion appropriate for disposition with oral argument upon review of the briefings, the motion will be scheduled accordingly. (gm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 as to Attorney James R. Morrison. (gm)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James R. Morrison. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6976499 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (sss)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James R. Morrison. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6976499. Filed by All Defendants. (Morrison, James)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #5 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 8/7/2020 for all defendants. (gm)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 as to Attorney Casie Collignon. (gm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Casie Collignon. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6946633. Filed by Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions) (Collignon, Casie)
July 7, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Casie Collignon. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6946633 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Beasley, Heather)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment f, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment) Filed by Therell Davis. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/13/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jn)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. For Invasion of Privacy, Defamation Per Se, Negligence, Negligence Per Se and Unfair Trade Practices Act Claims Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6830893 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Therell Davis against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Mandekor, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Progressive Universal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: James Morrison
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Heather C. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: James Morrison
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Heather C. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Corporation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: James Morrison
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Heather C. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: James Morrison
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Heather C. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therell Davis
Represented By: Gretchen L. Mandekor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?