Umpqua Bank v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Umpqua Bank
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00974
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by U.S. Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/20/2020. Filed by Umpqua Bank. (Farrell, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Shawn J. Larsen-Bright appearing on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A. Filed by on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Larsen-Bright, Shawn)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bank, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/16/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6852561 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Umpqua Bank against U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons). (Farrell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umpqua Bank v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shawn J. Larsen-Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umpqua Bank
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Christopher B. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?