Rosenblum v. John Does 1-10 et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Rosenblum
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, John Does 1-10 and Federal Protective Service
Amicus Curiae: City of Portland, Oregon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01161
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: David Morrell Filed by Federal Protective Service, John Does 1-10, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. (Warden, Andrew)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: : The City of Portland's Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae #24 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #23 Opinion & Order. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The attached PDF contained minor typographical errors. The following corrections were made to the record: A PDF that corrects these minor typographical errors has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
July 24, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Filed by City of Portland, Oregon. (Vannier, Denis)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order(#5 ) is DENIED. (See attached Opinion & Order.) Signed on July 24, 2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo) PDF replaced on 7/24/2020 (eo).
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 Proof of Certified Mailing Return of Service Unexecuted as to Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. (Potter, Sheila)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 Proof of Service Return of Service Executed as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 9/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Potter, Sheila)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 Proof of Service Return of Service Executed as to United States Customs and Border Protection Service served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 9/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Potter, Sheila)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 Proof of Service Return of Service Executed as to United States Marshals Service served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 9/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Potter, Sheila)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 Proof of Service Return of Service Executed as to Federal Protective Service served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 9/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Potter, Sheila)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTES of Proceedings: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held, regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Formal Order to follow. Steven M. Lippold and Sheila H. Potter present as counsel for plaintiff(s). David Morrell and Andrew Warden present as counsel for defendant(s).(Court Reporter Bonita Shumway.)Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of David M Morrell appearing on behalf of Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. Filed by on behalf of Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. (eo)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Filed by Federal Protective Service, John Does 1-10, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Warden, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Andrew Warden appearing on behalf of Federal Protective Service, John Does 1-10, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service Filed by on behalf of Federal Protective Service, John Does 1-10, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. (Warden, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Oral Argument is set for 7/22/2020 at 09:00AM-11:00AM in Portland by videoconference before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 Notice re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 Withdrawing Evidence in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Lippold, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Stephanie Debner . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Lippold, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of Tiffany L. Chapman . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Terri Preeg Riggsby . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Jennifer Arnold . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Mark Pettibone in Support of Rosenblum's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Sheila Potter . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit 7 of 7) (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Ellen Rosenblum. (Potter, Sheila)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Marshals Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons, #2 issued summons, #3 issued summons) (ecp)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/17/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/17/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7002755 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ellen F Rosenblum against FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, John Does 1-10, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Marshals Service (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration or Mark Pettibone, #2 Proposed Summons United States Department of Homeland Security, #3 Proposed Summons United States Customs and Border Protection, #4 Proposed Summons United States Marshals Service, #5 Proposed Summons Federal Protective Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Potter, Sheila)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7002755 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ellen F Rosenblum against FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, John Does 1-10, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Marshals Service (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration or Mark Pettibone, # 2 Proposed Summons United States Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Proposed Summons United States Customs and Border Protection, # 4 Proposed Summons United States Marshals Service, # 5 Proposed Summons Federal Protective Service, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Potter, Sheila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenblum v. John Does 1-10 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: David M Morrell
Represented By: Andrew Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: David M Morrell
Represented By: Andrew Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection Service
Represented By: David M Morrell
Represented By: Andrew Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Andrew Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Service
Represented By: David M Morrell
Represented By: Andrew Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Rosenblum
Represented By: Sheila H. Potter
Represented By: Steven M. Lippold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Portland, Oregon
Represented By: Tracy Pool Reeve
Represented By: Robert L. Taylor
Represented By: Denis M. Vannier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?