Anderson et al v. Davis Wright Tremaine LLP et al
Plaintiff: Diane Anderson, Carl Dyess, Michael Peterson, Kirby Dyess, Bonnie Buckley, Ed Wilson and Peter Koubeck
Defendant: Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Ross Miles, Pacific Premier Bank and Maureen Wile
Case Number: 3:2020cv01194
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Stockholder's Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332cl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Pacific Premier Bank waiver sent on 9/16/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kayser, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Motion to Remand to State Court #16 is taken under advisement as of 10/23/2020. Request for oral argument shall be considered in due course. (pjg)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Ronald Larson in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stephens, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration of Bridget M. Donegan in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through U) (Stephens, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stephens, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #14 . The Deadline for defendant Davis Wright Tremaine LLP to respond to the first amended complaint is postponed until 14 days after a final decision by this Court (including any objections to Findings and Recommendations) on the forthcoming motion to remand. (pjg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (DeJong, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2020 to correct docket text (sb).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #12 . Deadline for motion to remand is extended to 9/11/2020. (pjg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Donegan, Bridget)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Raminta A. Rudys appearing on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. Filed by Pacific Premier Bank. (Rudys, Raminta) Modified on 8/21/2020 to correct docket text (sb).
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Clifford S. Davidson appearing on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank Filed by on behalf of Pacific Premier Bank. (Davidson, Clifford)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Motion for Remand #8 . The deadline to file any motion to remand is extended to 9/4/2020. (pjg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to file a Motion for Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Donegan, Bridget)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Defendant Davis Wright Tremaine LLP's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Davis Wright Tremaine LLP's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, or other responsive pleading, is due by 9/11/2020. Ordered on 8/4/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (gw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer "Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint". Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (DeJong, Timothy)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Defendant Davis Wright Tremaine LLP's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Davis Wright Tremaine LLP's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, or other responsive pleading, is due by 8/7/2020. Ordered on 7/28/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (gw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (DeJong, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/20/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (DeJong, Timothy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv09418 from Multnomah County Circuit. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7019333 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (DeJong, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Davis Wright Tremaine LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Premier Bank
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Raminta A. Rudys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Wile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Anderson
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Dyess
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peterson
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Dyess
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Buckley
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Wilson
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Koubeck
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Bridget M. Donegan
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Represented By: Michael J. Esler, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?