Powell v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Powell
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01208
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Wakefield & Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2020. Filed by Kenneth Powell. (Jones, Kelly)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/24/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/24/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/24/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7026658 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kenneth Powell against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Mertens, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Powell
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Represented By: Christopher J. Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?