Lovell v. Salazar
Petitioner: Don Douglas Lovell
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Case Number: 3:2020cv01218
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order, #3 sent to Don Douglas Lovell returned as undeliverable. (sss)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Petitioner has neither submitted the filing fee nor moved to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Should Petitioner fail to do so, I will recommend that the case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 8/10/2020 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/10/2020.) (joha)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/27/2020.) (dsg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). Filed by Don Douglas Lovell against Josias Salazar. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovell v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Don Douglas Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?