Rumpakis Family Trust v. Regent Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rumpakis Family Trust
Defendant: Regent Insurance Company
Trustee: Louise B. Rumpakis and Mike K.J. Rumpakis
Case Number: 3:2020cv01271
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Regent Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Regent Insurance Company Filed by Louise B. Rumpakis, Mike K.J. Rumpakis, Rumpakis Family Trust. (Wright, Jason)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/1/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/31/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7057277 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mike K.J. Rumpakis, Louise B. Rumpakis, Rumpakis Family Trust against Regent Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Moore, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumpakis Family Trust v. Regent Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Louise B. Rumpakis
Represented By: Christine N. Moore
Represented By: Jason A. Wright
Represented By: Melina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mike K.J. Rumpakis
Represented By: Christine N. Moore
Represented By: Jason A. Wright
Represented By: Melina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rumpakis Family Trust
Represented By: Christine N. Moore
Represented By: Jason A. Wright
Represented By: Melina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regent Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?