Knutson v. Watson
Petitioner: Robin Lee Knutson
Respondent: Watson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01315
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is DISMISSED. Where the dismissal is for lack of jurisdiction, the Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability on the basis that Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right pursuant to 28 U. S.C. 2253 (c) (2). Pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 8/24/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/25/2020.) (dsg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO DISMISS: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 is summarily dismissed f or lack of jurisdiction. Signed on 8/24/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/25/2020.) (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/6/2020.) (joha)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). (NO IFP Filed, NO Filing Fee Paid) Filed by Robin Lee Knutson against Watson. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knutson v. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robin Lee Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?