Arango-Moreno v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Gustavo Arango-Moreno
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv01316
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 1 is denied, and his Complaint #2 is summarily dismissed. Should Plaintiff wish to continue with this case, he must file a completed in forma pauperis application and an amended complaint only on his own behalf. Signed on 8/25/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed order, complaint form and IFP application to Pro Se party on 8/26/2020.) (dsg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/6/2020.) (joha)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Filed by Gustavo Arango-Moreno against United States of America. (joha)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Gustavo Arango-Moreno. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arango-Moreno v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Arango-Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?