Pellicano v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Christina S. Pellicano
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America and Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv01320
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 11/3/2020, at 10:00 AM by telephone. (Call-in numbers to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on Monday, 11/2/2020. Ordered on 8/26/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ecp)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Hern, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/4/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice re Notice of Removal,, #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal,, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal) (Hern, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. Filed by All Defendants. (Hern, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Filed by All Defendants. (Hern, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV23166 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Under 28 USC Sections 1332, 1441, and 1446 (Diversity of Citizenship) Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7078574 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hern, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pellicano v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Hern
Represented By: Rosa O. Ostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Hern
Represented By: Rosa O. Ostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina S. Pellicano
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: Jane Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?