Lexington Insurance Company and Metro v. Insinkerator
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro
Defendant: InSinkErator
Case Number: 3:2020cv01370
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss #6 . Filed by InSinkErator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Testimony of Maury Holland) (Morrison, Wesley)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 Reply Brief to Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #6 . Filed by InSinkErator. (Morrison, Wesley)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE BY THE CLERK: Currently there is not full consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in this case. If any non-consenting party would like to consent to proceed before Judge Beckerman, the consent form is attached and may be filed electronically by using the Consent event under Other Filings/Consent in the Civil menu or delivered to the Clerk's Office. For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. If full consent is not filed, Judge Beckerman will enter her Findings and Recommendation ("F&R") on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ) and refer the F&R to a U.S. District Judge. The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. (gw)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #16 ). All case management deadlines are stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ). The parties are to file a joint proposed case management plan within 30 days of a final ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Ordered on 10/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Motion to Modify Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro. (Smith, Carson)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ). Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #14 ) is deemed timely filed. Ordered on 9/22/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #6 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Smith, Carson)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Declaration) (Smith, Carson)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by InSinkErator. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #6 .) (Morrison, Wesley)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Wesley Ward Morrison, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #8 ). Ordered on 9/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #7 ) for James E. Breitenbucher. Ordered on 9/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro. (Smith, Carson)
September 9, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Wesley Ward Morrison, Jr.. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7208198 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 9, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James E. Breitenbucher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7208015 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Wesley Ward Morrison, Jr.. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7208198. Filed by InSinkErator. (Morrison, Wesley)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney James E. Breitenbucher. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7208015. Filed by InSinkErator. (Breitenbucher, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by InSinkErator. (Lyon, Wendy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by InSinkErator. (Lyon, Wendy)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro. (Smith, Carson)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to InSinkErator. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7107244 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lexington Insurance Company and Metro against InSinkErator (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Pickett, Waylon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro v. Insinkerator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro
Represented By: Waylon J. Pickett
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InSinkErator
Represented By: Wesley Ward Morrison, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Breitenbucher
Represented By: Wendy E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?