Davison et al v. Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan
Plaintiff: Juliet Davison and James Davison
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 3:2020cv01387
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta - Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Wednesday, October 21, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided by separate sealed entry. (pjg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Maloney, Francis)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV19152 from Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7113093 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (Maloney, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davison et al v. Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Francis J. Maloney, III
Represented By: Scott A. MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Davison
Represented By: Robert E.L. Bonaparte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davison
Represented By: Robert E.L. Bonaparte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?