Kiasantana, LLC et al v. Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon et al
Plaintiff: Koerner Camera Systems, Inc. and Kiasantana, LLC
Defendant: City of Portland and Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01419
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/26/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Keating, Reilley)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/18/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/19/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/19/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement -Koerner Camera Systems, Inc.. Filed by Kiasantana, LLC, Koerner Camera Systems, Inc.. (Trinchero, Paul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement -Kiasantana, LLC. Filed by Kiasantana, LLC, Koerner Camera Systems, Inc.. (Trinchero, Paul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Inverse Condemnation Action Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7130098 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kiasantana, LLC, Koerner Camera Systems, Inc. against City of Portland, Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons). (Trinchero, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiasantana, LLC et al v. Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koerner Camera Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paul H. Trinchero
Represented By: Cynthia M. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiasantana, LLC
Represented By: Paul H. Trinchero
Represented By: Cynthia M. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portland
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-County Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Reilley D. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?