Project Veritas et al v. Schmidt et al
Plaintiff: Project Veritas Action Fund and Project Veritas
Defendant: Michael Schmidt, Oregon Attorney General Ellen Rosenblum and Ellen Rosenblum
Case Number: 3:2020cv01435
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 31 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule Joint case management plan. Filed by Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Marshall, Brian)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Rule 16 Conference is set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The court will be sending out the contact information. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 7, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Compel #22 is DENIED as moot with leave to refile. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTES of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction Heating held before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 for the reasons stated on the record. Parties' Joint Case Management Plan is due 10/21/20. A telephone status conference will be held the week of 10/26/20. This case is transferred from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Benjamin Barr and Stephen Klein present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brian Simmonds Marshall and Shaunee V. Morgan present as counsel for defendant(s). (Court Reporter Bonita Shumway.) Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance of Shaunee Vanessa Morgan appearing on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt Filed by on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Morgan, Shaunee)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction with memorandum in support of motion #11 . Oral Argument is set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00AM in Portland by videoconference before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants' Motion to Compel #22 on the under advisement calendar of 10/19/2020. The request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Should the Court deem the motion appropriate for disposition with oral argument upon review of the briefings, the motion will be scheduled accordingly. (gm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall in support of defendant's motion to compel deposition answers of James O'Keefe. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Marshall, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 Motion to Compel deposition answers of James O'Keefe. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Marshall, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction with memorandum in support of motion #11 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to PI Reply) (Barr, Benjamin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Filing of Video Exhibits 8,9 & 10 to Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshhall, #19 Filed by Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Related document(s): Declaration, #19 .) (rs)
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall in Support of Defendants' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #18 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit) (Marshall, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction with memorandum in support of motion #11 . Filed by Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Marshall, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #15 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 is extended to 9/18/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 7, 2020 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Michael Schmidt served on 8/28/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Unopposed). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ellen Rosenblum waiver sent on 8/28/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Stephen)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Carla Scott appearing on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt Filed by on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Scott, Carla)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance of Brian Simmonds Marshall appearing on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt Filed by on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Marshall, Brian)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with memorandum in support of motion. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C) (Barr, Benjamin)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 as to Attorney Stephen Klein. (gm)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Stephen Klein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7164585 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Stephen Klein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7164585. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Stephen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Attorney General Ellen Rosenblum. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Schmidt. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (rs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit 1 to verified Complaint, #1 . Physical DVD Media for Hand Filing, Filed by All Plaintiffs. (rs)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 as to Attorney Benjamin Barr. (gm)
August 24, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Benjamin Barr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7146759 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Benjamin Barr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7146759. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barr, Benjamin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Winters, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Verified Complaint. For Declaratory and Injunctive Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7144930 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Winters, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Veritas et al v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Veritas Action Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Barr
Represented By: Eric C. Winters
Represented By: Stephen Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Veritas
Represented By: Benjamin Barr
Represented By: Eric C. Winters
Represented By: Stephen Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schmidt
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: Shaunee Vanessa Morgan
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Attorney General Ellen Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Rosenblum
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: Shaunee Vanessa Morgan
Represented By: Brian Simmonds Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?