Dooley v. Airbnb, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Dooley
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc. and Miguel Sandoval
Case Number: 3:2020cv01537
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court will hold in abeyance Plaintiffs Motion #15 to Remand this matter until the Court has resolved the issue whether the stay in this case should be lifted. The briefing schedule for the filing of a motion to lift the stay as set out in the Courts Order 16 remains in effect. (bb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file no later than 11/4/2020 a motion to lift the stay in this case with supporting legal authority. Defendants response to Plaintiffs motion is due no later than 11/18/2020. No further reply is permitted and the Court will take the motion under advisement on 11/18/2020. The Court, however, authorizes Plaintiff to pursue service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Sandoval and to file with the Court proof on completion of such service. No other motion practice is allowed until the Court resolves the issue of the stay. (bb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Motion For Remand. Filed by Sherry Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Att A, #2 Attachment Att B, #3 Attachment Att C, #4 Attachment Att D, #5 Attachment Att E) (Callahan, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion #13 to Enlarge Time to Respond to Courts October 7, 2020 Minute Order. Pursuant to the Courts Order (#10) issued 10/7/2020, the Court again DIRECTS the parties after conferral to submit a joint email to Chambers_Brown@ord.uscourts.gov notifying the Court whether they are able to resolve the issue at hand. If the parties are unable to resolve how to proceed and Plaintiff wishes to pursue a motion to remand, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file no later than 10/21/2020 a motion with supporting arguments and authority to lift the stay. Any newly-filed motion must contain a LR 7-1 conferral certification. Defendant AirBNBs response to Plaintiffs motion to lift the stay will be due no later than 11/4/2020. No further reply will be permitted, and the Court will take the matter under advisement on 11/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Motion . Filed by Sherry Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of RAC) (Callahan, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Miguel Sandoval. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 First Proposed Summons Filed by Sherry Dooley. (Callahan, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown On 10/1/2020 Plaintiff filed a Motion #9 to Remand to State Court and for Attorney Fees and Just Costs. The district court requires a LR 7-1 Certification that the parties conferred before the filing of any motion. This Courts usual practice is to strike any motion that does not include such a certification, allow the parties to confer, and permit the party to re-file their motion. In this case, however, the Court notes on 9/25/2020 the parties filed a Stipulation #6 that Plaintiffs claim against AirBNB was subject to mandatory arbitration and requested the Court to stay this case pending completion of the arbitration. Accordingly, on 9/29/2020 the Court ordered this case STAYED (Order 8 ). Generally after a case is stayed the parties are not allowed to file any substantive motions with the Court. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Plaintiffs Motion #9 to Remand. The basis of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is the contention that the Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction due to a lack of diversity of citizenship between Plaintiff and Defendant AirBNB. The Court also notes the docket does not reflect Defendant Sandoval has been served with Summons and Complaint in this matter. The Court, therefore, DIRECTS the parties to confer regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Remand in light of the current stay and the agreement of the parties that Plaintiffs claim is subject to mandatory arbitration. If the parties are able to resolve this issue, the Court DIRECTS the parties to submit a single joint email to Chambers_Brown@ord.uscourts.gov notifying the Court of their agreement. If the parties are unable to resolve how to proceed and Plaintiff wishes to pursue a Motion to Remand, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file no later than 10/14/2020 a motion with supporting arguments and authority to lift the stay. Any newly-filed motion must contain a LR 7-1 conferral certification. Defendant AirBNBs response to Plaintiffs motion to lift the stay will be due no later than 10/28/2020. No further reply will be permitted, and the Court will take the matter under advisement on 10/28/2020. (bb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Motion To Remand. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Sherry Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Callahan, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court APPROVES the parties Stipulation #6 To Arbitrate Plaintiffs Claims Against Defendant AIRBNB, Inc. and GRANTS the Motion #6 to Stay Proceedings. The Court STAYS this case pending the outcome of the arbitration. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file a Joint Status Report upon completion of the arbitration or no later than 3/29/2021. (bb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Robert A Callahan appearing on behalf of Sherry Dooley Filed by on behalf of Sherry Dooley. (Callahan, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Pending Outcome. Filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Benn, Klarice)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS Defendant Airbnb, Inc.s Unopposed Motion #4 for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant Airbnbs response to Plaintiffs Complaint is now due no later than 9/25/20. (bb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint - Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Benn, Klarice)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/4/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Benn, Klarice)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV17802 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7198624 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Airbnb, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (Benn, Klarice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. Airbnb, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Dooley
Represented By: Robert Arthur Callahan
Represented By: Robert A Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Klarice A. Benn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?