Logan et al v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Heidelberg and Candice Logan
Defendant: Jane Doe and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01617
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #9 . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kafoury, Gregory)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/15/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jn)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Jessica Lancaster ISO Notice of Removal. Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Docs, #2 Exhibit RFP, #3 Exhibit Notice of Intent) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV28874 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7246551 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lancaster, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan et al v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Heidelberg
Represented By: Jason L. Kafoury
Represented By: Mark Gillis McDougal
Represented By: Gregory Kafoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Logan
Represented By: Jason L. Kafoury
Represented By: Mark Gillis McDougal
Represented By: Gregory Kafoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?