Konoloff et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Nichole L. Konoloff and Jason Eaves
Defendant: Subaru Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. and Subaru of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01622
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Service by Subaru of America, Inc. Filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Yoshida, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Yoshida, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Yoshida, Stephen)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV31071 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7248743 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Subaru of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Yoshida, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konoloff et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Knottnerus
Represented By: Stephen P. Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole L. Konoloff
Represented By: Louis P. Marcanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Eaves
Represented By: Louis P. Marcanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?