Dover v. Sachdev et al
Plaintiff: Eric A. Dover
Defendant: Naina Sachdev, Naveen Sachdev and Divesh Sachdev
Case Number: 3:2020cv01630
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Eric A. Dover regarding Summons Issued #6 . (ecp)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (ecp)
September 23, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 90252 issued. (fp)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to Eric A. Dover Regarding Notice Regarding Filing Fee 3 . (sb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE: Pursuant to LR 3-4(a), advance payment of all required fees or the filing of an application to proceed in forma pauperis must occur before the Clerks Office can provide any services covered under the Schedule of Fees adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States. Accordingly, you must either pay the appropriate filing fee in this case or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 5 days. Filing Fee must be paid by 9/28/2020. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/21/20.) (sb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/21/20.) (sb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. (No Fee or IFP Application Received.) Filed by Eric A. Dover against Divesh Sachdev, Naina Sachdev, Naveen Sachdev (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dover v. Sachdev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naina Sachdev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen Sachdev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divesh Sachdev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A. Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?