Amor Fati Holdings, Inc. et al v. Black Otter, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Hildebrand, Amor Fati Holdings, Inc. and Ryan Hildebrand
Defendant: Black Otter, Inc., Jack Ross and Synergy CHC Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01662
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Anit K. Jindal appearing on behalf of Synergy CHC Corp. Filed by on behalf of Synergy CHC Corp.. (Jindal, Anit)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended Scheduling Order: At the request of the parties, the 11/17/2020 Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESET to Tuesday, 12/08/2020 at 09:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Kelsey M. Benedick appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Benedick, Kelsey)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Christopher J. Kayser is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney William D. Miner, III Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kayser, Christopher)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Synergy CHC Corp.. (Starr, Adam)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 11/17/2020 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Synergy CHC Corp.. (Starr, Adam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Synergy CHC Corp.. (Starr, Adam)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV29170 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7274352 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Black Otter, Inc., Jack Ross, Synergy CHC Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Starr, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amor Fati Holdings, Inc. et al v. Black Otter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Otter, Inc.
Represented By: Adam M. Starr
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Ross
Represented By: Adam M. Starr
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy CHC Corp.
Represented By: Adam M. Starr
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Anit K. Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Hildebrand
Represented By: John A Magliana, Jr
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Kelsey M. Benedick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amor Fati Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Miner, III
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Kelsey M. Benedick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hildebrand
Represented By: John A Magliana, Jr
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: Kelsey M. Benedick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?