Escobar et al v. National Maintenance Contractors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raquel Escobar, Gerardo Ramirez-Solis, Karen Martinez, Edward Umana, Gregory Dikhaindzhiya, Solomon Denbel, Victor Hugo Garcia, Concepcion Solis, Marco Servin, Jorge Garcia, Gerardo Ramirez-Cruz, Hilda Arivazu, Ignacio Lopez, Maria Madrigal, Jessica Ramirez-Solis, Cecilia Gutierrez, Efrain Martinez, Patricia Alvarez, Luis Solis, Alejandro Sanchez, Luis Alfaro, Maura Escobar, Zetzael Madrigal, Lilena Vasquez, Francisco Umana, Rafaela Gutierrez, Brenda Aceituno, Juan Aceituno, Silvia Barraza, Emmanuel Alvarez, Martha Dominguez, Concepcion Cruz, Rogelio Rodriguez, Ulisar Morales and Tatiana Dikhaindzhiya
Defendant: Marsden Services, LLC, National Maintenance Contractors, LLC and NMC Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01695
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Marsden Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to NMC Franchising, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to National Maintenance Contractors, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Prop Sum Marsden, #2 Proposed Summons Prop Sum Nattional) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #2 ) for Daniel Werner. Ordered on 10/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/1/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Werner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7303868 #2 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel Werner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7303868. Filed by Gerardo Ramirez-Solis, Gerardo Ramirez-Cruz, Silvia Barraza, Brenda Aceituno, Solomon Denbel, Marco Servin, Maura Escobar, Patricia Alvarez, Concepcion Cruz, Martha Dominguez, Zetzael Madrigal, Hilda Arivazu, Maria Madrigal, Luis Alfaro, Victor Hugo Garcia, Alejandro Sanchez, Cecilia Gutierrez, Concepcion Solis, Luis Solis, Francisco Umana, Jorge Garcia, Rafaela Gutierrez, Ulisar Morales, Ignacio Lopez, Raquel Escobar, Karen Martinez, Efrain Martinez, Edward Umana, Lilena Vasquez, Gregory Dikhaindzhiya, Juan Aceituno, Jessica Ramirez-Solis, Tatiana Dikhaindzhiya, Emmanuel Alvarez, Rogelio Rodriguez. (Werner, Daniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7300038 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Gerardo Ramirez-Cruz, Gerardo Ramirez-Solis, Silvia Barraza, Brenda Aceituno, Solomon Denbel, Marco Servin, Maura Escobar, Patricia Alvarez, Concepcion Cruz, Martha Dominguez, Zetzael Madrigal, Hilda Arivazu, Maria Madrigal, Luis Alfaro, Victor Hugo Garcia, Alejandro Sanchez, Cecilia Gutierrez, Concepcion Solis, Luis Solis, Francisco Umana, Jorge Garcia, Rafaela Gutierrez, Ulisar Morales, Ignacio Lopez, Raquel Escobar, Karen Martinez, Efrain Martinez, Edward Umana, Lilena Vasquez, Gregory Dikhaindzhiya, Juan Aceituno, Jessica Ramirez-Solis, Tatiana Dikhaindzhiya, Emmanuel Alvarez, Rogelio Rodriguez against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Master Chart of Parties, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Master Chart of Claims, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for National Maintenance Contractors LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for NMC Franchising, #6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Marsden Services). (Ledesma, Mayra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar et al v. National Maintenance Contractors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Escobar
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Ramirez-Solis
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Martinez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Umana
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dikhaindzhiya
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Denbel
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hugo Garcia
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Solis
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Servin
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Garcia
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Ramirez-Cruz
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Arivazu
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Lopez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Madrigal
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ramirez-Solis
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Gutierrez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Martinez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Alvarez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Solis
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Sanchez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alfaro
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura Escobar
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zetzael Madrigal
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilena Vasquez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Umana
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafaela Gutierrez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Aceituno
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Aceituno
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Barraza
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Alvarez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dominguez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Cruz
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Rodriguez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulisar Morales
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Dikhaindzhiya
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsden Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Maintenance Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMC Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?