Eisele v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Eisele
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01740
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 cl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Reply to Motion for Discovery and/or Inspection of contested jurisdictional information prior to motion to remand #10 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kathleen Eisele. (Egan, Jon)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Response in Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery) to Motion for Discovery and/or Inspection of contested jurisdictional information prior to motion to remand #10 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Hosenpud, David)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines #9 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion to remand is due on the earlier of: (1) 21 days after Defendant produces jurisdictional discovery, if the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery #10 ; or (2) 14 days after the Courts order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery #10 . The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e)(f) is stayed until the Court resolves any motion for remand. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 18, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Discovery and/or Inspection of contested jurisdictional information prior to motion to remand. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kathleen Eisele. (Egan, Jon)
October 18, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time , Motion for Stay . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Kathleen Eisele. (Egan, Jon)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/5/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of G. Edward Anderson, Ph.D. . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of Greg Foley . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of David G. Hosenpud . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Hosenpud, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV30398 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7335459 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2). (Hosenpud, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisele v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Eisele
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: David G. Hosenpud
Represented By: Hank Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?