Weinert v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diane Weinert
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Parke, Davis & Company, LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01854
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for More Definite Statement #9 . Filed by Parke, Davis & Company, LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Todaro, Anthony)
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for More Definite Statement #9 . Filed by Diane Weinert. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Attachment Declaration of Connor Sheehan, #3 Exhibit 1 NY State Court Complaints and Answers, #4 Exhibit 2 NY State Court Order Tolling SoL and SoR) (Sheehan, Connor)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Joint Motion #10 is GRANTED. The deadline to respond to Motion to Dismiss #9 is extended from 12/2/2020 to 12/9/2020. The deadline to reply is extended from 12/16/2020 to 12/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for More Definite Statement #9 . Filed by Diane Weinert. (Mosier, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for More Definite Statement. Filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Parke, Davis & Company, LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia LLC. (Todaro, Anthony)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Connor Sheehan #5 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Mosier #3 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
November 3, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Connor Sheehan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7447571 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Connor Sheehan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7447571. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheehan, Connor)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
October 30, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert A. Mosier. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7435506 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robert A. Mosier. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7435506. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mosier, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/29/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7424512 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Diane Weinert against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Rose, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinert v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Anthony A. Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Weinert
Represented By: S. Michael Rose
Represented By: Robert Mosier
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?