Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund an Oregon nonprofit corporation doing business as Northwest Workers' Justice Project
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management and U.S. Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 3:2020cv01871
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint,, . Filed by U.S. Department of Agriculture, U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (Danielson, Kevin)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Answer is due by 12/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Danielson, Kevin)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of Agriculture. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons) (ecp)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/29/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7436034 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund dba Northwest Workers' Justice Project against Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund dba Northwest Workers' Justice Project (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Prop Summ Atty Gen of US, #3 Proposed Summons Prop Summ US Atty Gen Dist of OR, #4 Proposed Summons Prop Summ BLM, #5 Proposed Summons Prop Summ USDA). (Ledesma, Mayra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund v. U.S. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Employment Education and Defense Fund an Oregon nonprofit corporation doing business as Northwest Workers' Justice Project
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?