Marshall v. Wells Fargo Rail Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Clinton O Marshall and Clinton O. Marshall
Defendant: SMBC Railcar Services, LLC, ACF Industries, LLC, BNSF Rail Company, Wells Fargo Rail Corporation, American Railcar Leasing LLC, Wyoming Colorado Railroad Inc doing business as Oregon Eastern Railroad and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01899
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 Affidavit of Service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 12/11/2020 Filed by Clinton O. Marshall. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #23 is GRANTED. Defendant SMBC Rail Services, LLCs Answer is now due 2/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of Timothy Coleman. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #25 .) (Coleman, Timothy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Coleman, Timothy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of B. John Casey in Support of Defendant SMBC Rail Services, LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Amended Complaint, #6 . Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 21, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance of Hansary LaForest appearing on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company Filed by on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (LaForest, Hansary)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Coleman, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Timothy J. Coleman appearing on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company Filed by on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Coleman, Timothy)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants Second Motion for Extension of Time #17 is GRANTED. Defendant BNSF Rail Companys Answer is now due 1/13/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Nicholas E. Wheeler . Filed by BNSF Rail Company. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #17 .) (Wheeler, Nicholas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by BNSF Rail Company. (Wheeler, Nicholas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service upon ACF Industries, LLC served on 11/9/2020; American Railcar Leasing LLC served on 11/9/2020; BNSF Rail Company served on 11/9/2020; SMBC Railcar Services, LLC served on 11/9/2020; Wells Fargo Rail Corporation served on 11/12/2020; Wyoming Colorado Railroad Inc served on 11/9/2020 Filed by Clinton O. Marshall. (Mandekor, Gretchen)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 and #14 . Attorney's Sara Ghadiri and David Audley added. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 3, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sara T. Ghadiri. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7575075 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 3, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David T.B. Audley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7575066 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 3, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Sara T. Ghadiri is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 .) (ecp)
December 3, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. David T.B. Audley is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 .) (ecp)
December 3, 2020 Entered in error Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David T.B. Audley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7575066 #13 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) Modified on 12/3/2020 (ecp).
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sara T. Ghadiri. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7575075. Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David T.B. Audley. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7575066. Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant SMBC Rail Services, LLCs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 is GRANTED. Defendant SMBC Rail Services, LLCs Answer is now due 12/31/20. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of B. John Casey in Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #9 .) (Casey, B.)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint, #6 . Filed by SMBC Railcar Services, LLC. (Casey, B.)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #4 is GRANTED. Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due 12/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint Personal Injury Claims for violations of Oregon Safe Employment Act, Employer Liability Law, Common Law Negligence, and Product Liability. Filed by Clinton O. Marshall against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Mandekor, Gretchen)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Nicholas E. Wheeler . Filed by BNSF Rail Company. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Wheeler, Nicholas)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by BNSF Rail Company. (Wheeler, Nicholas)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to ACF Industries, LLC, American Railcar Leasing LLC, BNSF Rail Company, SMBC Railcar Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Rail Corporation, Wyoming Colorado Railroad Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/5/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/5/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Personal Injury Claims for violations of Oregon Safe Employment Act, Employer Liability Law, Common Law Negligence, and Product Liability Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7452173 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Clinton O Marshall against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Mandekor, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Wells Fargo Rail Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Railcar Services, LLC
Represented By: Sara Taraneh Ghadiri
Represented By: David Audley
Represented By: B. John Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACF Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Rail Company
Represented By: David Patrick Morrison
Represented By: Nicholas E. Wheeler
Represented By: Amber Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Rail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Railcar Leasing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Colorado Railroad Inc doing business as Oregon Eastern Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Hansary LaForest
Represented By: Timothy J. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton O Marshall
Represented By: Gretchen L. Mandekor
Represented By: Timothy W. Grabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton O. Marshall
Represented By: Gretchen L. Mandekor
Represented By: Timothy W. Grabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?