Regal Cinemas, Inc. v. BV CenterCal LLC et al
Plaintiff: Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Defendant: BV CenterCal LLC, CenterCal LLC and Bridgeport Village L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02059
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice of Transfer to an Interest Bearing Account - Receipt Number: ORX300091554, Date Receipt Issued: 01/06/2021, Amount Collected $89,826.75. Related Doc 12 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds. (lp) (lp)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 Amended Answer to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Plaintiff's Amended Answer to BV CenterCal, LLC's Counterclaims. Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party - Bridgeport Village L.L.C. Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 16 Answer to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Plaintiff's Answer to BV CenterCal, LLC's Counterclaims. Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney David A. Anderson is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Emily S.B. Fullerton Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Fullerton, Emily)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 , Counterclaim BV CenterCal LLC. Filed by BV CenterCal LLC, CenterCal LLC. (Mullin, Joel)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Transfer to an Interest Bearing Account - Receipt Number: ORX300091219, Date Receipt Issued: 12/08/2020, Amount Collected $269,480.25. Related Doc #12 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds. (lp)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS: Finding as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit Funds (ECF No. #6 ), Granting Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Deposit Funds (ECF No. #10 ). Signed on 12/4/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - Order to Deposit Funds (Investment Registry Account). Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 Amended Motion to Deposit Funds . Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/18/2020. Ordered on 12/3/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - (proposed) Order to Deposit Funds (Treasury Registry Fund). Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Joel A. Parker in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds. Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to deposit funds #6 .) (Parker, Joel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Deposit Funds . Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Parker, Joel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Sondag, Samantha)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/30/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/29/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/29/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by BV CenterCal LLC, CenterCal LLC. (Sondag, Samantha)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Hashem Karoum in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal. Filed by BV CenterCal LLC, CenterCal LLC. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Sondag, Samantha)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV37917 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7556020 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by BV CenterCal LLC, CenterCal LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sondag, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regal Cinemas, Inc. v. BV CenterCal LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BV CenterCal LLC
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Represented By: Samantha K. Sondag
Represented By: Joel A. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenterCal LLC
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Represented By: Samantha K. Sondag
Represented By: Joel A. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeport Village L.L.C.
Represented By: Amy Edwards
Represented By: Samantha K. Sondag
Represented By: Joel A. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Represented By: Emily S.B. Fullerton
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Jessica Schuh
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?