Lopez-Pedro v. Richardson, et al
Plaintiff: C M S-L-, Angelina Lopez Pedro and C-M-S-L-
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr, Director, Texas Serv Gregory A. Richardson, Act. Secretary Chad Wolf, William P. Barr, Gregory A. Richardson and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv02066
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Return of service for Defendant Wolf, #2 Return of service for Defendant Richardson) (Smith, Philip)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to William P. Barr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chad F. Wolf. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gregory A. Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/6/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/6/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/6/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Philip)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 12/3/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Philip)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by C M S-L- against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: work authorization denial 09.30.2020, #2 Exhibit B: charging document, #3 Exhibit C: asylum application filed, #4 Exhibit D: I589 receipt notice, #5 Exhibit E: I589 biometrics notice, #6 Exhibit F: I765 receipt notice 05.01.2020, #7 Exhibit G: I765 approval for 1 child, #8 Exhibit H: I765 denial.514.2020, #9 Exhibit I: I-765 receipt notice 05.26.2020, #10 Exhibit J: work card for 2nd child, #11 Exhibit K: I765 denial 06.18.2020, #12 Exhibit L: I765 receipt 08.20.2020, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons). (Smith, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Pedro v. Richardson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C M S-L-
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Lopez Pedro
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-M-S-L-
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Texas Serv Gregory A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act. Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?