REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Real Estate Exchange REX and REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,
Defendant: Steve Strode, Kate Brown, OREGON REAL ESTATE AGENCY, Debra Gisriel, Oregon Real Estate Board, Kim Heddinger, Patricia Ihnat, Jose Gonzalez, Susan Glen, Marie Due, David E. Hamilton, Lawnae Hunter and Alex D. MacLean, III
Case Number: 3:2020cv02075
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #17 .Defendants' answer or other response to the Complaint is due on or before 2/19/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Harry B. Wilson appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Wilson, Harry)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of David B. Markowitz appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Markowitz, David)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #13 . Defendants' response to the Complaint is due on or before January 18, 2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond or Answer. Filed by All Defendants. (Nord, Tim)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Grey, Herbert)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Michael C. Toth's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 ; Granting Christopher L. Peele's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 ; Granting Cory R. Liu's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,. (Grey, Herbert)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,. (Grey, Herbert)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Christopher L. Peele is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 .) (ecp)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Michael C. Toth is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 .) (ecp)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cory R. Liu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569347. Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,. (Grey, Herbert)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christopher L. Peele. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569306. Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,. (Grey, Herbert)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael C. Toth. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569291. Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,. (Grey, Herbert)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/30/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/30/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Austin R. Nimocks. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7566085. Filed by Real Estate Exchange REX.
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Austin R. Nimocks. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7566085 #2 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cory R. Liu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569347 #6 , attorney Christopher L. Peele. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569306 #5 , andattorney Michael C. Toth. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7569291 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7563048 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Real Estate Exchange REX against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Grey, Herbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate Exchange REX
Represented By: Herbert G. Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.,
Represented By: Herbert G. Grey
Represented By: David Austin R. Nimocks
Represented By: Cory Liu
Represented By: Christopher Peele
Represented By: Michael Christopher Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Strode
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OREGON REAL ESTATE AGENCY
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Gisriel
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Real Estate Board
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Heddinger
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ihnat
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Glen
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Due
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Hamilton
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawnae Hunter
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex D. MacLean, III
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Tim D. Nord
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?