White v. United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee White
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv02259
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service served on 1/13/2021 Filed by Daniel Lee White. (Pickett, J.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Daniel Lee White. (Pickett, J.)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/28/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/28/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/28/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7694107 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Daniel Lee White against United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Pickett, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee White
Represented By: J. Randolph Pickett
Represented By: R. Brendan Dummigan
Represented By: Shangar S. Meman
Represented By: Kimberly O. Weingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?