Supreme Steel, Inc. v. Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust et al
Plaintiff: Supreme Steel, Inc.
Defendant: Phil Casciato, John Doe(s), Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III, Dawn Cartwright, Rajneel Maharaj, Lawrence Gerads and Felix Antich
Case Number: 3:2021cv00061
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Stay (ECF No. #17 ). This matter is stayed until 4/14/2021. If progress is being made toward a settlement, the parties may extend the stay for an additional period of 90 days. Signed on 1/29/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated Motion for Stay . Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Rajneel Maharaj waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lawrence Gerads waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Zanley Galton, III waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Phil Casciato waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Dawn Cartwright waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Felix Antich waiver sent on 1/26/2021. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Russell S. Buhite appearing on behalf of Felix Antich, Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Dawn Cartwright, Phil Casciato, Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III, Lawrence Gerads, Rajneel Maharaj Filed by on behalf of Felix Antich, Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Dawn Cartwright, Phil Casciato, Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III, Lawrence Gerads, Rajneel Maharaj. (Buhite, Russell)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Felix Antich, Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Dawn Cartwright, Phil Casciato, Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III, Lawrence Gerads, Rajneel Maharaj. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc. against Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Phil Casciato, Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III, Dawn Cartwright, Rajneel Maharaj, Felix Antich, Lawrence Gerads (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended and New Summonses). (Hamilton, Wm.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Phil Casciato, Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust, Zanley Galton, III. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/14/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/14/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (cw)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc.. (Hamilton, Wm.) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/15/2021) (cw).
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7776528 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Supreme Steel, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Hamilton, Wm.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supreme Steel, Inc. v. Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Casciato
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Employers-Shopmen's Local 516 Pension Trust
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanley Galton, III
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Cartwright
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajneel Maharaj
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Gerads
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Antich
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supreme Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Wm. Brent Hamilton, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?