Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc. and Pride at Work
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor, Jenny Yang, Al Stewart and Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs
Case Number: 3:2021cv00089
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to Jenny Yang served on 1/25/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Jones, Karianne)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to Al Stewart served on 1/25/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Jones, Karianne)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to U.S. Department of Labor served on 1/25/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Jones, Karianne)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs served on 1/25/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Jones, Karianne)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stay #15 . The Parties are to file a Status Report by 5/11/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Stay . Filed by All Defendants. (Luh, James)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of James Luh appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Luh, James)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Pride at Work against Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs, Al Stewart, U.S. Department of Labor, Jenny Yang. (Jones, Karianne)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sean A. Lev #9 for Plaintiffs is granted. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7828066. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robin F. Thurston #8 for Plaintiffs is granted. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827974. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Karianne M. Jones #7 for Plaintiffs is granted. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827899. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sean A. Lev. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7828066. Filed by Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Pride at Work. (Lev, Sean)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robin F. Thurston. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827974. Filed by Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Pride at Work. (Thurston, Robin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Karianne M. Jones. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827899. Filed by Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Pride at Work. (Jones, Karianne)
January 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sean A. Lev. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7828066 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robin F. Thurston. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827974 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Karianne M. Jones. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7827899 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/21/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/21/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sss)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Pride at Work. Filed by American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., Pride at Work. (Stark, Whitney)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement of American Federation of Teachers. Inc.. Filed by American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., Pride at Work. (Stark, Whitney)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc.. Filed by American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., Pride at Work. (Stark, Whitney)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7806647 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc., American Federation of Teachers, Inc., Pride at Work against Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs, Al Stewart, U.S. Department of Labor, Jenny Yang (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stark, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Tradeswomen, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney B. Stark
Represented By: Sean Lev
Represented By: Robin Thurston
Represented By: Karianne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney B. Stark
Represented By: Robin Thurston
Represented By: Sean Lev
Represented By: Karianne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pride at Work
Represented By: Whitney B. Stark
Represented By: Robin Thurston
Represented By: Sean Lev
Represented By: Karianne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Yang
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Stewart
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?