Hooks v. Hood River Distillers, Inc.
Petitioner: Regional Director Ronald K. Hooks and Ronald K. Hooks
Respondent: Hood River Distillers Inc and Hood River Distillers, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund and Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670
Case Number: 3:2021cv00268
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 52 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 51 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Barish, Noah)
April 16, 2021 Filing 50 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Show Cause and Evidentiary Hearing held on April 2, 2021, before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Jill L. Jessup, telephone number (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter at (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov or PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 4/23/2021. Redaction Request due 5/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2021. (jjcr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 49 Proposed Findings of Fact and conclusions of law. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 48 MINUTES OF SHOW CAUSE AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING: The parties shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by Friday, April 16, 2021, with an email copy to the Courtroom Deputy. This matter will be taken under advisement on April 16, 2021. Irene Hartzell Botero, Sarah Ingebritsen, Anne P. Pomerantz, and Paul A. Thomas present as counsel for Petitioner. Dennis E. Westlind and Kristin Bremer present as counsel for Respondent. Noah T. Barish present as counsel for Amicus Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. Noelle E. Dwarzski present as counsel for Amicus Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund. Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) Modified on 4/2/2021 to correct type of filing due to the Court. (mja).
April 1, 2021 Filing 47 Sur-Reply to Petition for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc. (Bremer, Kristin) Modified on 4/5/2021 to add language (sb).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Surreply (ECF #45 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 31, 2021 Filing 45 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bremer, Kristin)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - Amicus Teamsters Local 670's Motion to Quash (ECF #37 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Court quashes the disputed aspects of the subpoena except for the requests for Michael Beranbaum's calendar and possibly for the draft press releases, depending on the circumstances of their drafting, as discussed herein. Signed on 3/30/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 29, 2021 Filing 43 Brief Reply Brief to Respondent's response to Petition for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service) (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 29, 2021 Filing 42 Amicus Reply In Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Amicus Motion to Quash Subpoena #37 . Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Barish, Noah)
March 26, 2021 Filing 41 Response to Amicus Motion to Quash Subpoena #37 . Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Westlind, Dennis)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Amicus Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670's reply in support of its motion to quash subpoena (ECF #37 ) is due by noon on Monday, March 29, 2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - Respondent Hood River Distillers, Inc. is directed to respond to the Motion to Quash Subpoena (ECF #37 ) filed by Amicus Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670 by Friday, March 26, 2021, at noon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 24, 2021 Filing 38 Amicus Declaration of Noah Barish In Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena. Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Related document(s): Motion to Quash #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Barish, Noah)
March 24, 2021 Filing 37 Amicus Motion to Quash Subpoena. Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Barish, Noah) .
March 22, 2021 Filing 36 Amended Response . Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition #21 .) (Bremer, Kristin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 35 Declaration of Kristin Bremer Moore . Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response #34 .) (Bremer, Kristin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 34 Response . Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition #21 .) (Bremer, Kristin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 33 Response to #21 Petition . Filed by Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Westlind, Dennis)
March 15, 2021 Filing 32 Amicus Brief in Support of Petition Section 10(j) for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Nick Malone, #2 Attachment Declaration of Aron Butler, #3 Attachment Declaration of Maria Elisea, #4 Attachment Declaration of Disenia Lara, #5 Attachment Declaration of Jason Cameron) (Barish, Noah)
March 15, 2021 Filing 31 Brief in Support of Petition . Filed by Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
March 12, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Paul A Thomas appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (Thomas, Paul)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended Order to Show Cause - A Show Cause Hearing is set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00AM by videoconference, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed on 3/4/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Scheduling Order - The Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. are STRICKEN. Amended Order to Show Cause to follow. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - The Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund's Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae (ECF #26 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 2, 2021 Filing 26 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
March 1, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of filing of amendments to petition, proposed order and Exhbits 24-25 Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 1, 2021 Filing 24 Certificate of Service by Ronald K. Hooks for Documents filed March 1, 2021 Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 1, 2021 Filing 23 Amended Proposed Form of Order Submitted for interim order for relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 1, 2021 Filing 22 Exhibits 24-25 Additional exhibits to Memo of Points and Authorities. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 1, 2021 Filing 21 Amended Petition for preliminary injunctive relief (statutory fee exempt status selected). Filed by Ronald K. Hooks against Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order - At the parties' request, the Court is resetting the in-person Preliminary Injunction and Show Cause Hearing to be held by videoconference, set for the same date and time of Friday, March 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with videoconference connection information by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Dennis E. Westlind appearing on behalf of Hood River Distillers, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Westlind, Dennis)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670's Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae (ECF #15 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Kristin L. Bremer appearing on behalf of Hood River Distillers, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Hood River Distillers, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 Amended Certificate of Service by Ronald K. Hooks in support of injunctive relief Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670. (Barish, Noah)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Interim Order for Relief (ECF #12 ). The Interim Order was entered in error and is STRICKEN from the record. The Court will STRIKE the entry and notify the parties. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order to Show Cause - A Show Cause Hearing is set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed on 2/23/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (See ECF #14) Interim Order for Relief. Signed on 2/23/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order - The Court sets a Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 3/26/2021 at 10:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Irene Hartzell Botero appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (Botero, Irene)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Ingebritsen appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (Ingebritsen, Sarah)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 Alternative Notice of Appearance of Irene Hartzell Botero appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Additional counsel Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Botero, Irene)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Ronald K. Hooks, Regional Director for Petition for injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Service by Ronald K. Hooks for petition for injunctive relief Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Order for a Hearing to Show Cause for preliminary injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Proposed Form of Order Submitted for preliminary injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support for preliminary injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-23) (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for preliminary injunctive relief (statutory fee exempt status selected). Filed by Ronald K. Hooks against Ronald K. Hooks (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Pomerantz, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Hood River Distillers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hood River Distillers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hood River Distillers, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis E. Westlind
Represented By: Kristin L. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regional Director Ronald K. Hooks
Represented By: Anne P. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald K. Hooks
Represented By: Anne P. Pomerantz
Represented By: Irene Hartzell Botero
Represented By: Sarah Ingebritsen
Represented By: Paul A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Board of Trustees of the Oregon Processors Employees Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Teamster Food Processors, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 670
Represented By: Noah T. Barish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?