Watson v. loanDepot.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Nichole Watson
Defendant: loanDepot.com, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00300
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by loanDepot.com, LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2021. Filed by Nichole Watson. (Del Carlo, Hope)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Aaron A. Wagner appearing on behalf of loanDepot.com, LLC Filed by on behalf of loanDepot.com, LLC. (Wagner, Aaron)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/26/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/26/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Nichole Watson. (Del Carlo, Hope)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7944943 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nichole Watson against loanDepot.com, LLC. (Del Carlo, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. loanDepot.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: loanDepot.com, LLC
Represented By: Aaron A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Watson
Represented By: Hope A. Del Carlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?