Seiko Epson Corporation et al v. E TOP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Epson Portland Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation and Epson America, Inc.
Defendant: Shuping Hong Hurley, E TOP, LLC and Xuming Hong
Case Number: 3:2021cv00484
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Elizabeth White is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Brenna K. Legaard Filed by All Plaintiffs. (White, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #11 . Deadline for Answer is extended to 5/24/2021. (pjg)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Legaard, Brenna)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent. (sb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. Service specifically made upon Other Agency. (Legaard, Brenna)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 for Attorney Tigran Guledjian and Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 for Attorney Richard H. Doss. (pjg)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Richard H. Doss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8022194. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Legaard, Brenna)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tigran Guledjian. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8022153. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Legaard, Brenna)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO Form 120). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Legaard, Brenna) Modified on 4/7/2021 to add language (sb).
April 2, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tigran Guledjian. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8022153 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 2, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Richard H. Doss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8022194 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to E TOP, LLC, Xuming Hong, Shuping Hong Hurley. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/30/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Legaard, Brenna)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8018626 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons). (Legaard, Brenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seiko Epson Corporation et al v. E TOP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuping Hong Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E TOP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuming Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epson Portland Inc.
Represented By: Brenna K. Legaard
Represented By: Tigran Guledjian
Represented By: Richard H. Doss
Represented By: Elizabeth Heather White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By: Brenna K. Legaard
Represented By: Tigran Guledjian
Represented By: Richard H. Doss
Represented By: Elizabeth Heather White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Brenna K. Legaard
Represented By: Tigran Guledjian
Represented By: Richard H. Doss
Represented By: Elizabeth Heather White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?