Progressive Services, Inc. v. Flatline Roofing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Services, Inc., dba Progressive Roofing and Progressive Services, Inc. an Arizona corporation doing business as Progressive Roofing
Defendant: Flatline Roofing, LLC, John and Jane Does I-X, Corin Pike and ABC Doe Corporations I-X
Counter Defendant: Progressive Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00494
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Counterclaims #13 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is now due by June 10, 2021. It is so ordered. (jy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims Re: Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim #12 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selden, David)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Progressive Services, Inc.. Filed by Corin Pike. (Liss, Serena)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) - Defendant Flatline Roofing, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Filed by Flatline Roofing, LLC. (Anderson, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 by attorney David A. Selden. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
April 19, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Selden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8043777 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Selden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8043777. Filed by Progressive Services, Inc.. (Selden, David)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant Flatline Roofing LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #6 is GRANTED. Defendant Flatline Roofing LLC's response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is now due by April 19, 2021. It is so ordered. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendant Corin Pike's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Defendant Pike's response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is now due by May 10, 2021. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. Filed by Flatline Roofing, LLC. (Anderson, David) Modified on 4/11/2021 to add link to related entry (sb).
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. Filed by Corin Pike. (Liss, Serena) Modified on 4/11/2021 to add link to related entry (sb).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/30/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/30/2021. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sb)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Flatline Roofing, LLC. (Anderson, David)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of David A. Anderson in Support of Defendant Flatline Roofing, LLC's Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by Flatline Roofing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - First Amended Complaint) (Anderson, David) Modified on 4/7/2021 to add link to related docket entry (sb).
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV05177 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-8021231 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Flatline Roofing, LLC. (Anderson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Services, Inc. v. Flatline Roofing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flatline Roofing, LLC
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Represented By: Darien S. Loiselle
Represented By: Audrey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corin Pike
Represented By: Aaron W. Baker
Represented By: Serena Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Doe Corporations I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Services, Inc., dba Progressive Roofing
Represented By: Heidi Nunn-Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Services, Inc. an Arizona corporation doing business as Progressive Roofing
Represented By: Heidi Nunn-Gilman
Represented By: David A. Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Progressive Services, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Nunn-Gilman
Represented By: David A. Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?