Hume v. Guardian Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Hume
Defendant: Unknown or Unidentified, Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson and Uptown Tower Apartments
Case Number: 3:2021cv00517
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Terminating Rebecca Cambreleng as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 6/1/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/1/2021.) (mja)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because counsel will be out on maternity leave beginning June 2021 and does not have sufficient time to handle this matter . Filed by Michelle Hume. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #11 .) (Cambreleng, Rebecca)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Appointing Rebecca Cambreleng for Michelle Hume as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 5/28/2021. Signed on 5/14/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/14/2021.) (mja)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Terminating Jollee Faber Patterson as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 4/27/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/27/2021.) (mja)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Due to a conflict, termination of the appointment is requested. Filed by Michelle Hume. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #8 .) (Patterson, Jollee)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Appointing Jollee Faber Patterson for Michelle Hume as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 4/27/2021. Signed on 4/13/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/13/2021.) (mja)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF #1 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 4/13/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/13/2021.) (mja)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Sean Douglas McKean appearing on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments Filed by on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. (McKean, Sean)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Sean Douglas McKean appearing on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments Filed by on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. (McKean, Sean)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Christopher J. Drotzmann appearing on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments Filed by on behalf of Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. (Drotzmann, Christopher)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/7/2021.) (kgc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Michelle Hume against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibits 2-5, #3 Exhibits 6-9, #4 Exhibits 10, #5 Civil Cover Sheet). (kgc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michelle Hume. (kgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hume v. Guardian Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown or Unidentified
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Management LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Simonson
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uptown Tower Apartments
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hume
Represented By: Rebecca Cambreleng
Represented By: Jollee Faber Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?