Johnson v. Brenneke et al
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Defendant: Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Kelly Paine, Uptown Tower Apartments, Sunshine Sales, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Garrett Lamar Miles and Thomas Brenneke
Case Number: 3:2021cv00582
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 30 Response to Motion for Order(27 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR). Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments, Guardian Real Estate Services.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (McKean, Sean)
June 17, 2021 Filing 29 Response to Motion for Order(28 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR). Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments, Guardian Real Estate Services.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (McKean, Sean)
June 16, 2021 Filing 28 Motion titled 'Request for Equitable Relief to Prevent Defendant's Presentation to the Court of my Conference Work Product". Filed by Larry Johnson.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 16, 2021 Filing 27 Motion for Declaratory Relief. Filed by Larry Johnson. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 16, 2021 Filing 26 Reply to Motion to Seal the Case. Filed by Larry Johnson. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 11, 2021 Filing 25 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Larry Johnson.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 8, 2021 Filing 24 Response in Opposition to Motion to Seal the Case(20 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 20 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR, 20 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR, 20 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR). Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments, Guardian Real Estate Services.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (McKean, Sean)
June 8, 2021 Filing 23 Declaration of Sean D. McLean in Support of Reply in Support of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Motions. Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments, Guardian Real Estate Services. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(11 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(9 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (McKean, Sean)
June 8, 2021 Filing 22 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (11 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (9 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments, Thomas Brenneke.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (McKean, Sean)
June 4, 2021 Filing 21 Declaration of Larry Johnson to Support of FRCP Reply. Filed by Larry Johnson, Larry D. Johnson. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion(19 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 19 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR).)Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (sb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 20 Motion to Seal the Case. Filed by Larry Johnson, Larry D. Johnson. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (sb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (11 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR)(9 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR). Filed by Larry Johnson, Larry D. Johnson.Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (sb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 Declaration of Larry Johnson. Filed by Larry Johnson. (Related document(s): Response to Motion (14 in 3:21-cv-00685-JR).)Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Entry of Default. Filed by Larry Johnson. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (11 in 3:21-cv-00582-JR). Filed by Larry Johnson. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR (joha)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Plaintiff has requested the appointment of pro bono counsel but has not formally moved for such appointment. The Court directs plaintiff to the Court's webpage "Applying for Pro Bono Representation" at https://ord.uscourts.gov/index/php/2015-02-10-16-10-22/applying-for-pro-bono. The Clerk will also provide plaintiff a copy of the Court's form "Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel." (See attachment.) Plaintiff will then have 14 days to move for appointment of pro bono counsel, and then an additional 30 days after either retaining pro bono counsel or electing to proceed pro se to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00582-JR, 3:21-cv-00685-JR) (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/28/21.) (gm)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services, Uptown Tower Apartments, Lisa Simonson and Kelly Paine's Motion to Consolidate #12 . Case no. 3:21-cv-582-JR is designated as the Lead Case and all documents filed subsequent to this Order should bear the caption: 3:21-cv-582-JR; Johnson v. Brenneke et al (Lead Case) and 3:21-cv-685-JR; Johnson v. Brenneke et al (Trailing Case). (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/28/21.) (gm)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services, Uptown Tower Apartments, Lisa Simonson and Kelly Paine's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #11 on the under advisement as of 6/28/2021. The request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Should the Court deem the motion(s) appropriate for disposition with oral argument upon review of the briefings, the motion(s) will be scheduled accordingly. Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due by 6/9/2021. Defendants' reply to motion to dismiss due by 6/23/2021. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/27/21.) (gm)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Consolidate . Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. (Drotzmann, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Uptown Tower Apartments, Kelly Paine, Guardian Management LLC, Lisa Simonson, Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC. (Drotzmann, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Sean Douglas McKean appearing on behalf of Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. Filed by Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Uptown Tower Apartments. (McKean, Sean)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Thomas Brenneke served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Guardian Management LLC served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Guardian Real Estate Services LLC served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Garrett Lamar Miles served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Kelly Paine served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Lisa Simonson served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Sunshine Sales served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021; Uptown Tower Apartments served on 5/7/2021, answer due on 5/28/2021. (joha)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Garrett Lamar Miles, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson, Sunshine Sales, Uptown Tower Apartments. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (joha)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Christopher J. Drotzmann appearing on behalf of Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson Filed by on behalf of Thomas Brenneke, Guardian Management LLC, Guardian Real Estate Services LLC, Kelly Paine, Lisa Simonson. (Drotzmann, Christopher)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/20/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/20/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/21/2021.) (joha)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Signed on 4/21/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/21/21.) (gm)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/20/2021.) (joha)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Larry Johnson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Larry Johnson. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brenneke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Management LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Simonson
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Paine
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uptown Tower Apartments
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Real Estate Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Lamar Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Brenneke
Represented By: Christopher J. Drotzmann
Represented By: Sean Douglas McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?