Vaughan v. Addo et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Vaughan
Defendant: Andrew Addo and J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00589
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 7/19/2021 at 2:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Rossmiller, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., and Andrew Addo's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Trial Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Andrew Addo. (Rossmiller, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Andrew Addo served on 5/27/2021 Filed by Margaret Vaughan. (Oh-Keith, Douglas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. served on 5/27/2021 Filed by Margaret Vaughan. (Oh-Keith, Douglas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Addo, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (eo)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/18/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/17/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/17/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8048383 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Margaret Vaughan against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Andrew Addo, #3 Proposed Summons J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.). (Oh-Keith, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Addo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Vaughan
Represented By: Douglas P. Oh-Keith
Represented By: Thomas D. D'Amore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Addo
Represented By: David P. Rossmiller
Represented By: Andrew T. Gust
Represented By: Ryan Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Rossmiller
Represented By: Andrew T. Gust
Represented By: Ryan Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?