Doad et al v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarabjit Doad and Gurjit S. Doad
Defendant: Leroy Tillman, Jr., C.R. England, Inc., Jane Doe Tillman and Does I-X
Case Number: 3:2021cv00645
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 22 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (joha)
June 22, 2021 Filing 21 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 21, 2021 Filing 20 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 21, 2021 Filing 19 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by C.R. England, Inc., Leroy Tillman, Jr. (Ashton, Derek)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Gurjit S. Doad. (Mallove, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 6/11/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Form of Order Submitted for Protective Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Ashton, Derek)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 7/19/2021 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 Defendants' Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Jane Doe Tillman, Leroy Tillman, Jr, Does I-X, C.R. England, Inc.. (Ashton, Derek)
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Leroy Tillman, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons Filed by Gurjit S. Doad, Sarabjit Doad. (Grube, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 as to Attorney Daniel P. Mallove. (gm)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel P. Mallove. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071884. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mallove, Daniel)
May 6, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel P. Mallove. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071884 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8061282. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Sussman Shank LLP Related Doc #8 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by C.R. England, Inc., Leroy Tillman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically) (Ashton, Derek)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by C.R. England, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 5/10/2021. (lp)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Ashton, Derek)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/27/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/27/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/27/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Case to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Ashton, Derek)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Ashton, Derek)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Kelly Lowrey In Support of Notice of Removal to Federal Court. Filed by C.R. England, Inc., Leroy Tillman, Jr. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Ashton, Derek)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV14085 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8061282 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Leroy Tillman, Jr, C.R. England, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal). (Ashton, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doad et al v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarabjit Doad
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Daniel P Mallove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurjit S. Doad
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Daniel P Mallove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Tillman, Jr.
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Tillman
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?