Pranger et al v. Oregon State University et al
Plaintiff: Garrett Harris and Danielle Pranger
Defendant: Trustee Preston Pulliams, Trustee Michele Longo Eder, Trustee Mike Bailey, Trustee Rani Borkar, Trustee F. King Alexander, Trustee Patricia M. Bedient, Trustee Stephanie Smith, Trustee Lamar Hurd, Trustee Julia Brim-Edwards, Oregon State University, Trustee Darald W Callahan, Trustee Paul J Kelly, Jr., Trustee Julie Manning, Trustee Michael G. Thorne and Trustee Kirk E. Schueler
Case Number: 3:2021cv00656
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Conference held. The Court discussed a possible conflict of interest. Daniel Kurowski, Paul Barton and Kathleen Lally present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Nathan Morales, Sarah Crooks and Stephen English present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Ryan White. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 6/22/2021 at 10:30AM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Morales, Nathan)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #14 . Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due 6/14/2021, Plaintiffs' Response is due 7/20/2021, and Defendants' Reply, if any, is due 8/3/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pvh)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Morales, Nathan)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Kathleen P. Lally (ECF #12 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mja)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kathleen P. Lally. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8097164 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (sss)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kathleen P. Lally. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8097164. Filed by Garrett Harris, Danielle Pranger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lally, Kathleen)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Steve Berman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 on behalf of Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Daniel J. Kurowski's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 on behalf of Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) Modified on 5/14/2021 to correct attorney name. NEF will be regenerated (jp).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steve W, Bernan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8080860 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) Modified on 5/14/2021 to correct attorney's name(ecp).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Kurowski . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8080857 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) Modified on 5/14/2021 to correct attorney's name (ecp).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Steve Berman Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8080860. Filed by Garrett Harris, Danielle Pranger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Berman, Steve) Modified on 5/14/2021 to correct docket text to reflect attorney appearing Pro Hac Vice (ecp).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Kurowski. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8080857. Filed by Garrett Harris, Danielle Pranger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Kurowski, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2021 to correct docket text to reflect attorney appearing Pro Hac Vice (ecp).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #6 . Responsive pleading is due 6/7/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion. Filed by F. King Alexander, Mike Bailey, Patricia M. Bedient, Rani Borkar, Julia Brim-Edwards, Darald W Callahan, Michele Longo Eder, Lamar Hurd, Paul J Kelly, Jr, Julie Manning, Oregon State University, Preston Pulliams, Kirk E. Schueler, Stephanie Smith, Michael G. Thorne. (Morales, Nathan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #3 Case Reassignment Notice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: A PDF with incorrect judge and staff information was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/30/2021) (eo).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/30/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/27/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kgc)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV08719 from Multnomah County Circuit Court of Oregon. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8064097 issued.. Filed by Darald W Callahan, Preston Pulliams, Oregon State University, F. King Alexander, Kirk E. Schueler, Julie Manning, Julia Brim-Edwards, Lamar Hurd, Patricia M. Bedient, Mike Bailey, Michele Longo Eder, Rani Borkar, Paul J Kelly, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Crooks, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pranger et al v. Oregon State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Preston Pulliams
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Michele Longo Eder
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Mike Bailey
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Rani Borkar
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee F. King Alexander
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Patricia M. Bedient
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Lamar Hurd
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Julia Brim-Edwards
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State University
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Darald W Callahan
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Paul J Kelly, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Julie Manning
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Michael G. Thorne
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Kirk E. Schueler
Represented By: Gregory J. Mina
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Nathan R. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Harris
Represented By: Paul B. Barton
Represented By: Alexander Graven
Represented By: Neil N. Olsen
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Kathleen P. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Pranger
Represented By: Paul B. Barton
Represented By: Alexander Graven
Represented By: Neil N. Olsen
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Kathleen P. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?