Eleiko Group AB v. Kadlub et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Eleiko Group AB
Defendant: Chris D Duffin, Rudy A Kadlub, Kabuki Strength Lab and Elite Strength Equipment LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00775
Filed: May 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent. (sb)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 4 ) for Brian K. Brookey. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chris D Duffin, Elite Strength Equipment LLC, Kabuki Strength Lab, Rudy A Kadlub. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/20/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/18/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sb)
May 21, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian K. Brookey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8090552 4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian K. Brookey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8090552. Filed by Eleiko Group AB. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Brookey, Brian)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Eleiko Group AB. (Ostrander, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 Report on Filing of an Action of a Patent or Trademark. Filed by Eleiko Group AB. (Ostrander, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8089865 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: US 10,881,893 B2--1/5/2021--Eleiko Group AB. Filed by Eleiko Group AB against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Ostrander, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eleiko Group AB v. Kadlub et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris D Duffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy A Kadlub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabuki Strength Lab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Strength Equipment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleiko Group AB
Represented By: Brian K. Brookey
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Represented By: William A. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?