Cordwell v. Celebrity Yacht Group LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Paul Cordwell
Defendant: Celebrity Yacht Group LLC, Stephen Johnson and Janice Marie Johnson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00845
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8107108. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Owen W. Dukelow Related Doc #10 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (nd)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Stephen Johnson served on 7/14/2021 Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Janice Marie Johnson served on 7/14/2021 Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #8 upon Celebrity Yacht Group LLC served on 7/14/2021 Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Complaint, #1 duplicate payment. Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment copy of the electronic payment receipt for paying the fee the second time, #2 Attachment copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) for the complaint from the system transaction in CM/ECF during which the payment was made) (Dukelow, Owen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (sb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Celebrity Yacht Group LLC, Janice Marie Johnson, Stephen Johnson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/4/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Paul Cordwell in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 6/14/2021. (lp)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Janice Marie Johnson Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Stephen Johnson Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Celebrity Yacht Group LLC Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Paul Cordwell. (Dukelow, Owen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. for Copyright Infringement Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8107266 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VAu 1-257-551--CA_5737_Inteflight_CA2_0791--Paul Henry Cordwell. Filed by Paul Cordwell against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 Example of Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 Demand Letter). (Dukelow, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordwell v. Celebrity Yacht Group LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cordwell
Represented By: Owen Warner Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Yacht Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Marie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?