Granados v. OnPoint Community Credit Union
Plaintiff: Jenna Granados
Defendant: OnPoint Community Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2021cv00847
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 8/26/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Unopposed). Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union. (McGair, Kimberley)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 7/26/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jp)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union. (McGair, Kimberley)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon OnPoint Community Credit Union served on 6/4/2021 Filed by Jenna Granados. (Sugerman, David)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to OnPoint Community Credit Union. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (kgc)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8107292 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jenna Granados against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Dahab, Nadia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granados v. OnPoint Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Granados
Represented By: David F. Sugerman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnPoint Community Credit Union
Represented By: Kimberley Hanks McGair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?