Graymar Environmental Services, Inc. v. McInnis et al
Plaintiff: Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.
Defendant: River City Environmental, Inc., Stephen James McInnis and Graymar Environmental, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00951
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTES of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #17 is GRANTED in part as to Defendants Stephen James McInnis, Graymar Environmental Services, Inc., and Graymar Environmental, Inc. and DENIED as to Defendant River City Environmental, Inc., as stated on the record. The Parties shall jointly submit a proposed case management schedule. Matthew R. Berry present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Thomas R. Rask, III present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Plaintiffs Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Extension #25 is GRANTED. The Temporary Restraining Order #12 is extended to 8/3/21 as to all Defendants. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
July 23, 2021 Filing 27 Response to Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Extension #25 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Rask, Thomas)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Extension #25 is due 7/23/21. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Extension. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 8/3/2021 at 01:30PM - 02:30PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order EXTENSION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65 #17 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 21, 2021 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service upon Stephen James McInnis served on 7/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Filing 22 Reply to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order EXTENSION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65 #17 . Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 Declaration of Stephen James McInnis . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #20 .) (Rask, Thomas)
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order EXTENSION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65 #17 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Rask, Thomas)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion #17 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Extension #17 is GRANTED. The Temporary Restraining Order #12 is extended to 7/27/21. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief #17 is due 7/15/21. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 9, 2021 Filing 18 Supplemental Declaration of MATTHEW R. BERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER EXTENSION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #17 .) (Berry, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order EXTENSION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 65. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon River City Environmental, Inc. served on 6/30/2021 Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Sokol, Jan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Graymar Environmental Services, Inc. served on 6/30/2021 Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Sokol, Jan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Graymar Environmental, Inc. served on 6/30/2021 Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Sokol, Jan)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: STRIKING the Temporary Restraining Order Hearing is set for 6/29/2021 at 01:30PM - 2:30PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, pursuant to Temporary Restraining Order #12 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed on 6/29/21 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of James D. O'Donnell appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc., Graymar Environmental, Inc., Stephen James McInnis, River City Environmental, Inc.. (O'Donnell, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Zachary B. Walker appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc., Graymar Environmental, Inc., Stephen James McInnis, River City Environmental, Inc.. (Walker, Zachary)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Thomas R. Rask, III appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc., Graymar Environmental, Inc., Stephen James McInnis, River City Environmental, Inc.. (Rask, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Response is due by 6/28/2021, regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 . Temporary Restraining Order Hearing is set for 6/29/2021 at 01:30PM - 2:30PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of MICHAEL S. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GRAYMAR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Berry, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of MATTHEW R. BERRY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GRAYMAR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Berry, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.. (Berry, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Graymar Environmental Services, Inc., Graymar Environmental, Inc., Stephen James McInnis, River City Environmental, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8136770 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Graymar Environmental Services, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons James McInnis, #3 Proposed Summons River City, #4 Proposed Summons Graymar Environmental Services, #5 Proposed Summons Graymar Envirmonmental). (Berry, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graymar Environmental Services, Inc. v. McInnis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Rask, III
Represented By: James D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Zachary B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen James McInnis
Represented By: Thomas R. Rask, III
Represented By: James D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Zachary B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graymar Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Rask, III
Represented By: James D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Zachary B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graymar Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Berry
Represented By: Jan D. Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?