Greenspan et al. v. Anglade et al
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Greenspan and Aequitas Capital Management, Inc.
Defendant: Jerome Anglade and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01014
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order. Lawrence R. Ream is appointed as pro hac vice counsel for receiver Ronald F. Greenspan, pursuant to order (#8) entered in 3:21-cv-954-JR on 8/2/21. The pro hac vice filing fee is waived in this case. Signed on 8/2/2021 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sss)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Service Papers Received. Summons as to Jerome Anglade. Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service., Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerome Anglade. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/6/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kgc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8151023 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ronald F. Greenspan, Aequitas Capital Management, Inc. against Jerome Anglade, John Does 1-10 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Helton, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenspan et al. v. Anglade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Greenspan
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aequitas Capital Management, Inc.
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Anglade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?