Greenspan, et al v. Matrix Capital Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Carepayment, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company, Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company, Carepayment, LLC and Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC
Defendant: Matrix Capital Group, Inc., a New York corporation, John Does 1-10 and Matrix Capital Group, Inc.
Receiver: Ronald F. Greenspan
Case Number: 3:2021cv01018
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order. Lawrence R. Ream is appointed as pro hac vice counsel for receiver Ronald F. Greenspan, pursuant to order (#8) entered in 3:21-cv-954-JR on 8/2/21. The pro hac vice filing fee is waived in this case. Signed on 8/2/2021 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Matrix Capital Group, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/9/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/9/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 12/9/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jtj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8151123 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ronald F. Greenspan, Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company, Carepayment, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company against John Does 1-10, Matrix Capital Group, Inc., a New York corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Helton, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenspan, et al v. Matrix Capital Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carepayment, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carepayment, LLC
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Capital Group, Inc., a New York corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Ronald F. Greenspan
Represented By: Troy Greenfield
Represented By: Anna M. Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?