Turkoly v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tracey K. Turkoly
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01019
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Scott Pomeroy (ECF #9 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Pomeroy. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8187452. Filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Pomeroy, Scott)
August 10, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott Pomeroy. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8187452 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by September 10, 2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Russell S. Buhite appearing on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Tracey K. Turkoly. (Sell, Scott)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/9/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/9/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 12/9/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8151177 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Tracey K. Turkoly against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turkoly v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey K. Turkoly
Represented By: Scott A. Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Represented By: Scott Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?