Clark v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dawn Marie Clark
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv01080
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 8/11/2021, answer due on 12/9/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Halpern, Ari)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Kelly Arefi appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Arefi, Kelly)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Diana Swisher Andsager appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Andsager, Diana)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney D. James Tree (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ari D. Halpern. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8166161 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney D. James Tree . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8166161. Filed by Dawn Marie Clark. (Halpern, Ari) Modified to correct name of pro hac attorney on 7/23/2021 (sss).
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 7/22/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Dawn Marie Clark. (Halpern, Ari)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) Prior case number: 3:19-cv-01518. Filed by Dawn Marie Clark against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Halpern, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Marie Clark
Represented By: Ari D. Halpern
Represented By: D. James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Diana Swisher Andsager
Represented By: Kelly Arefi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?