Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc. v. United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378
Plaintiff: Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc.
Defendant: United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378
Case Number: 3:2021cv01090
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Danielle Franco-Malone appearing on behalf of United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378. Filed by United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378. (Franco-Malone, Danielle)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/23/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc.. (Abraham, Kyle)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8167143 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc. against United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1 and 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Abraham, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc. v. United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Steel Rolling Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle T. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers International Union Local 8378
Represented By: Danielle Franco-Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?