Conecsus LLC v. Filter Technology LTD
Plaintiff: Conecsus LLC
Defendant: Filter Technology LTD
Case Number: 3:2021cv01218
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Reply to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #27 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Conecsus LLC. (Ostrander, John)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Review of its Motion to Reconsider to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #27 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Filter Technology LTD. (Rask, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Aliza Malouf regarding Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 29 . (dls)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #28 by attorney Samuel M Andre. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Samuel M Andre. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8236799. Filed by Filter Technology LTD. (Andre, Samuel)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Samuel M Andre. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8236799 #28 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Conecsus LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Ostrander, John)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #24 . Attorney Edward S. Cox added. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Edward S Cox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8205897. Filed by Conecsus LLC. (Cox, Edward)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Edward S Cox. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8205897 #24 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of 5 Additional ECF Entries (19-24) Transferred from the District of Texas Northern re Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01034 #19 . Filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Doc 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Leave, #2 Doc 20 Conecsus Resp and Brief to FTL Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Doc 21 Appendix and Affidavit in Support of Venue Response, #4 Doc 22 Defendant's Response to Motion for Reconsideration, #5 Doc 23 Pff's Supp to its Mot for Reconsideration and Leave, #6 Doc 24 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration) (joha)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Aliza Malouf, Edward S Cox and Samuel M Andre regarding Scheduling 22 . (dls)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the scheduling order #14 . Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Status report due by 2/4/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo) (Copy electronically sent to non-admitted counsel via regenerated NEF.)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Northern District of Texas (Dallas). Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #19 . (eo)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01034. Electronic file received.
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case out of District. This matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/17/2021) (ygl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Appendix in Support filed by Filter Technology LTD re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Filter Technology LTD with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Conecsus LLC. (Cox, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Status Report due by 2/4/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/21/2021) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On 6/11/2021 defendant filed a notice of removal in this case, but plaintiff has not complied with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.2, which requires that [w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/21/2021) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (as modified by the court). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/11/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Conecsus LLC. (Cox, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Filter Technology LTD. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Malouf, Aliza) Modified text on 6/3/2021 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Andre. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/24/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Samuel M. Andre (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11913592) filed by Filter Technology LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/17/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/20/2021) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER:Defendant's notice of removal, filed 5/7/021, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff Conecsus, LLC. No later than 14 days from the date of this order,defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/20/2021) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Filter Technology LTD. (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Filter Technology LTD. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Filter Technology LTD. (Malouf, Aliza) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Filter Technology, LTD. (Filing Fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11874045 .) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Malouf, Aliza) Modified filing fee information on 5/7/2021 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conecsus LLC v. Filter Technology LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conecsus LLC
Represented By: Edward S Cox
Represented By: Mary Rebecca Torres
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filter Technology LTD
Represented By: Aliza Malouf
Represented By: Samuel M Andre
Represented By: Thomas R. Rask, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?